U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00336
  • Case Name: Corkrean v. Drake University et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Documents Sent]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Transcript Request]
  • March 16, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • February 28, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 08, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 01, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 18, 2022: [Leave]
  • January 03, 2022: [Compel]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 23, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 23, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 22, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 08, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • December 06, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 06, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Reply]
  • November 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 12, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 03, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • November 02, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • November 02, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • November 02, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 01, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • November 01, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Compel]
  • October 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 29, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice - Other]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • January 05, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 04, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 03, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.