U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02057
  • Case Name: Lotz et al v. Onco Group, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Stay]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Judgment under Rule 54(b)]
  • April 12, 2021: [Judgment as a Matter of Law]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.