U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00340
  • Case Name: Lee-White v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 07, 2021: [Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • August 06, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • February 04, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.