U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Smithfield Packaged Meats Sales Corp. v. Dietz & Watson, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 15, 2022: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • June 09, 2022: [Errata]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Disbursement of Funds]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 21, 2022: [Stipulation]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • August 09, 2021: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • August 09, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 14, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 12, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 11, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 11, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 03, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • May 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 03, 2021: [Reply]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 28, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 27, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 27, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 26, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • April 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 23, 2021: [Set Aside/Reconsider]
  • April 21, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2021: [Errata]
  • April 16, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 16, 2021: [Compel]
  • April 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 12, 2021: [Errata]
  • April 12, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 12, 2021: [Compel]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 26, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 22, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 11, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 11, 2021: [Seal]
  • March 11, 2021: [Set Aside/Reconsider]
  • March 01, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • February 26, 2021: [Order]
  • February 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 25, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order]
  • February 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 16, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 15, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 11, 2021: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • February 11, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 11, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 10, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • February 09, 2021: [Leave]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice - Other]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order]
  • January 25, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 25, 2021: [Status Report]
  • January 20, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • January 13, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 12, 2021: [Objections - Generic]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice - Other]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Compel]
  • December 28, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 24, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 23, 2020: [Objections - Generic]
  • December 22, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 22, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • December 22, 2020: [Errata]
  • December 21, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • December 21, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 18, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • December 11, 2020: [Compel]
  • December 11, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2020: [Compel]
  • December 10, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • December 08, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 07, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • December 07, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 02, 2020: [Compel]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 24, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 23, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • November 23, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 23, 2020: [Compel]
  • November 23, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 17, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 12, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • November 10, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 10, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 09, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 09, 2020: [Compel]
  • November 06, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.