U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Jordan v Richardson, et al.,
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • September 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 04, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 01, 2021: [Leave to File]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Leave]
  • September 30, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 03, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 22, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 22, 2020: [Consolidate Cases]
  • December 22, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 15, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 11, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 10, 2020: [Consolidate Cases]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 09, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 03, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 10, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 06, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.