U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00216
  • Case Name: Guy et al. v. Ford Storage & Moving, Co.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 09, 2021: [Stipulation]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Notice - Other]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 30, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • March 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 05, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • March 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 29, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 23, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 22, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 22, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 21, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 17, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 15, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 14, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2020: [Seal]
  • November 16, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 16, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.