U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00368
  • Case Name: Advance Trust & Life Escrow Services, LTA v. North American Company for Life and Health Insurance
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice - Other]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • November 23, 2022: [Errata]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • November 22, 2022: [Errata]
  • November 22, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • November 21, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • November 21, 2022: [Errata]
  • November 21, 2022: [Leave to File]
  • November 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 18, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • November 18, 2022: [Strike]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Statement]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • October 21, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • October 18, 2022: [Statement]
  • October 17, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 14, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • October 04, 2022: [Compel]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 26, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • September 23, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • September 16, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • September 06, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 02, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 26, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • August 26, 2022: [Compel]
  • August 23, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 18, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2022: [Sealed Document]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Reply]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 13, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2022: [Statement]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Certify Class]
  • March 22, 2022: [Strike]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 01, 2021: [Declaration]
  • November 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • October 25, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • October 11, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • October 11, 2021: [Strike]
  • October 08, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 07, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Transcript]
  • August 03, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • August 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Strike]
  • July 16, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 14, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 29, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 24, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 24, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 10, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 10, 2021: [Leave]
  • June 10, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 04, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Expedite]
  • May 24, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • May 21, 2021: [Expedite]
  • May 21, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 15, 2021: [Certify Class]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • February 23, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • February 23, 2021: [~Util - Document Sealed]
  • February 17, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 09, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.