U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Iowa Laborers' District Council Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Calacci Construction Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 15, 2022: [Status Report]
  • December 06, 2022: [Status Report Order]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 16, 2021: [Judgment Debtor Exam]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Judgment Debtor Exam]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Partial Judgment]
  • April 13, 2021: [Default Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • March 25, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Default Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • November 11, 2020: [Default Entry by Clerk]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.