U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00347
  • Case Name: Nettles v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • July 19, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Transcript]
  • June 11, 2021: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • June 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 17, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • March 16, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 16, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • March 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2021: [Witness List]
  • March 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 09, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 03, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.