U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00345
  • Case Name: Lemke v. Iowa Pacific Processors, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
  • June 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 04, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 25, 2021: [Status Report]
  • May 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 03, 2021: [Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice - Other]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 17, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Order]
  • December 31, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 31, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 30, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 07, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 04, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2020
  • November 15, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.