U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00328
  • Case Name: Haltom v. Auto-Owners Insurance
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 11, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • December 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 09, 2020: [Statement]
  • December 08, 2020: [Remand to State Court]
  • December 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order]
  • December 04, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order]
  • November 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 13, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.