U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00275
  • Case Name: Champagne et al v. Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Seal]
  • March 19, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 18, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 18, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 18, 2022: [Reply]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 21, 2021: [Seal]
  • December 20, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 20, 2021: [Seal]
  • December 20, 2021: [Declaration]
  • December 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • June 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 16, 2021: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice - Other]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 07, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 03, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 20, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 17, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 13, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.