U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00331
  • Case Name: Guy v. DMG Installations, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 26, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 24, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 14, 2022: [Status Report]
  • January 07, 2022: [Status Report Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • October 22, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 07, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • October 05, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • October 04, 2021: [Brief /Other]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • September 02, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 30, 2021: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Consent]
  • August 02, 2021: [Closing Documents]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • June 18, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice - Other]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Stay]
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 21, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 20, 2021: [Stay]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 11, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 11, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 08, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 04, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 01, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice - Other]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 25, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 21, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 20, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 19, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 18, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 15, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 15, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 14, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 08, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 08, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 07, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 25, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 18, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.