U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Yoder et al v. Allianz Life Insurance Comany of North America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 12, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 08, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 26, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 17, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 05, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order]
  • November 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 25, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • November 24, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 19, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 18, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.