U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Jaye v. Barr et al--PER #3 ORDER PLAINTIFF AUTHORIZED TO EMAIL HER PLEADINGS - PER #25 ORDER - EMAIL AND MAIL ALL DOCKETED FILINGS TO PLT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Recusal]
  • March 29, 2021: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [Recusal]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Seal]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2020: [Strike]
  • December 01, 2020: [Writ]
  • December 01, 2020: [Default Entry]
  • December 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.