U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00036
  • Case Name: RICHTER & SON TOWING, INC. v. RZ EXPRESS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 05, 2021: [Leave to File]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 25, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 24, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 27, 2021: [Reply]
  • January 26, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 26, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 20, 2021: [Leave]
  • January 20, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • December 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 17, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 07, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 04, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 01, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.