U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00367
  • Case Name: Burnham v. Bayer CropScience LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Substitute Party]
  • February 09, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 05, 2021: [Substitute Party]
  • February 04, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 26, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 25, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 19, 2021: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • January 11, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 11, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 22, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 03, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.