U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-04007
  • Case Name: Guntert & Zimmerman Construction Division, Inc v. Gomaco Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 17, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • December 10, 2024: [Stay]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.