U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-03057
  • Case Name: Fiddler v. turbocut Jopp GmbH et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 10, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 18, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • February 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 15, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.