U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-03058
  • Case Name: Thome et al v. Sayer Law Group PC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 10, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 25, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 18, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 10, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Dismiss]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Dismiss]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 04, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.