U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00100
  • Case Name: Rippenkroeger v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • January 27, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 17, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2021: [Remand]
  • December 06, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • October 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • June 09, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 04, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.