U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00099
  • Case Name: Acuity v. AKN LeClaire, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Status Report]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice - Other]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice - Other]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Status Report Order]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Status Report]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Appoint Expert]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Brief /Other]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [Appoint Expert]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 17, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2021: [Errata]
  • April 15, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • March 11, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 25, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 24, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 03, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 28, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 28, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 28, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • December 22, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • December 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 07, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • December 07, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.