U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00380
  • Case Name: Williams v. Kreg Enterprises, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 27, 2022: [Stipulation]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • December 27, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Status Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice - Other]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • March 31, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 30, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 11, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2021
  • January 18, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.