U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00104
  • Case Name: Moon Seed LLC v. Weidner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • August 10, 2022: [Disbursement of Funds]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • July 19, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 19, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • July 15, 2022: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • July 15, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 23, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • June 20, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 16, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Stay]
  • June 14, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 14, 2022: [Documents Sent]
  • June 13, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 13, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 13, 2022: [Compel]
  • June 13, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 10, 2022: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 10, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 10, 2022: [Stay]
  • June 08, 2022: [Compel]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • June 03, 2022: [Alter Judgment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Alter Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 27, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 03, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • April 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 30, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 30, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • March 15, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 14, 2022: [Errata]
  • March 11, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 07, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 01, 2022: [Show Cause]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Transcript]
  • February 02, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 18, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 18, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 18, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 17, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • January 06, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 04, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 14, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 14, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 14, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 13, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • December 13, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 23, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • November 22, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 22, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • September 10, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 09, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 08, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Bond]
  • April 22, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 14, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 23, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 17, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 16, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 09, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 01, 2021: [Reply]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
  • January 25, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • January 15, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 11, 2021: [Errata]
  • January 08, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order]
  • December 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 30, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • December 28, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • December 28, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 17, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 14, 2020: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • December 11, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.