U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-01047
  • Case Name: Horsford v. Nordstrom Distribution Management, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 14, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Dismiss]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 15, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 19, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.