U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00107
  • Case Name: Vorwald v. MECTA Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 29, 2021: [Stipulation]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Status Report]
  • April 20, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 05, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 05, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 09, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 08, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 08, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 11, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 14, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.