U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Marken v. Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2021: [Dismiss]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 14, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.