U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-01006
  • Case Name: Kalashian et al v. Wausau Homes, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • June 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 01, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 19, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Continue Trial]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.