U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-04054
  • Case Name: Norambuena et al v. Western Iowa Tech Community College et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 23, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 16, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 29, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 29, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • June 29, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • June 28, 2021: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • June 18, 2021: [Stay]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
  • May 05, 2021: [Stay]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 29, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 16, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 15, 2021: [Stay]
  • March 15, 2021: [Strike]
  • March 15, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 15, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 15, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 12, 2021: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 23, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 26, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 25, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 20, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 20, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 04, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 17, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.