U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02097
  • Case Name: Cornice & Rose International, LLC v. Four Keys, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 04, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 03, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • July 02, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 03, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • February 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 26, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 25, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 11, 2021: [Dismiss]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 30, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 28, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • December 17, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.