U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00108
  • Case Name: Watson v. Olympic Steel Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • November 11, 2021: [Status Report]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Status Conference]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 08, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 06, 2021: [Protective Order]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • March 19, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Order]
  • January 27, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 27, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 27, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 19, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 30, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 29, 2020: [Order]
  • December 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 28, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 23, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 21, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.