U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00394
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Comer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Status Report]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Status Report]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Status Report]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 19, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 10, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 18, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Status Report]
  • February 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Errata]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 22, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.