U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02105
  • Case Name: Smith v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 15, 2022: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to Amend/Correct]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 23, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 23, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.