U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-03046
  • Case Name: Lanning v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Case Ready for Decision]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Brief]
  • August 31, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 04, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.