U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00415
  • Case Name: Thompson v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 13, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2022: [Remand]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 15, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 03, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Remand]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
November, 2021
  • November 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 09, 2021: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • August 09, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order]
  • April 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 01, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 04, 2021: [Errata]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.