U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00001
  • Case Name: John & Jim, Inc. et al v. Insurance Auto Auctions Corp.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Closing Documents]
  • August 25, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • August 09, 2022: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 21, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • May 18, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 18, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • May 17, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • May 11, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • May 11, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 04, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 20, 2022: [Compel]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Compel]
  • December 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 22, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • October 14, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • October 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • October 01, 2021: [Seal]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Seal]
  • September 30, 2021: [Compel]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice - Other]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice - Other]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 25, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 25, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 24, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 09, 2021: [Errata]
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 08, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 08, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order]
  • February 18, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 17, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 17, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • February 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 27, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • January 18, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 07, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.