U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00134
  • Case Name: Karg et al v. Transamerica Corporation et al SEE ORDER ON ATTY FEES AT [25] WHEN FINAL JUDGMENT IS ENTERED See #79 Order dismissing plt Sutton
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • October 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.