U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02086
  • Case Name: Mulcahy v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Case Ready for Decision]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.