U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00007
  • Case Name: Loyd v. Des Moines Area Community College
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 18, 2022: [Stipulation]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 04, 2022: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • March 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • February 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 20, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 17, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 07, 2021: [Notice - Other]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 01, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • March 10, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 09, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 25, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.