U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Sterk v. Hassel Family Chiropractic D.C. P.C. Employer Stock Ownership Plan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 05, 2022: [Stipulation]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 27, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • December 10, 2021: [Sealed Document]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Sealed Document]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 22, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • September 22, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • September 22, 2021: [Protective Order]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • April 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
  • April 02, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 02, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order]
  • February 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 26, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 10, 2021: [Errata]
  • February 09, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 04, 2021: [Errata]
  • February 03, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 19, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • January 19, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 15, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.