U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Holdren v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 13, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 11, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • August 11, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • March 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 02, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 18, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 18, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 18, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.