U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Downs et al v. Centrome, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • March 05, 2021: [Joinder]
  • March 02, 2021: [Joinder]
  • March 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Errata]
  • February 22, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Errata]
  • January 22, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • January 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 21, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 19, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 19, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.