U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-04057
  • Case Name: Van Dyken et al v. Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • September 20, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • September 15, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 05, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 04, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.