U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Hydro-Klean, LLC v. Cassidy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 30, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • March 17, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • March 16, 2021: [Errata]
  • March 16, 2021: [Default Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 01, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 01, 2021: [Errata]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.