U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00007
  • Case Name: Piatz v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [New Trial]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [New Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Trial Exhibits]
  • September 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 28, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • September 27, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • September 27, 2022: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • September 27, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • September 27, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 26, 2022: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • September 26, 2022: [Jury Challenge Sheet (Sealed)]
  • September 23, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • September 22, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 21, 2022: [Motion in Limine]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • September 08, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • September 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2022: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • September 05, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 05, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • September 05, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 02, 2022: [Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 18, 2022: [In Limine]
  • August 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 03, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice - Other]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 30, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 30, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 04, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • August 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 18, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 10, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 11, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 09, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • February 03, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.