U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00008
  • Case Name: Bern v. Menard, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 06, 2021: [Stipulation]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 09, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • February 18, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 17, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 16, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 08, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 04, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 03, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 03, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.