U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Gamadid et al v. United States Department of State et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 10, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 09, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 08, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Mandamus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.