U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Steffes v. State of Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 24, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 24, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 23, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 08, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 03, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Substitute Party]
  • May 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • April 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 16, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Status Conference]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 30, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 27, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 26, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 19, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 08, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 26, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 08, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.