U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00039
  • Case Name: Borst et al v. Covington Specialty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 06, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • March 02, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • February 26, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 10, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.