U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02098
  • Case Name: Nissen et al v. Cedar Falls Community School District
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [In Limine]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Seal]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 11, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 23, 2021: [Sealed Motion Access to Selected Parties]
  • September 23, 2021: [Seal]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 09, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 18, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 12, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.